This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 23:30:20 (UTC).

MCLESKEY, JOYCE E, MCLESKEY, WILLIAM D JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 MCLESKEY, JOYCE E, MCLESKEY, WILLIAM D JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Decedent

MCLESKEY, WILLIAM D JR

Not Classified By Court

MCLESKEY, JOYCE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

NICHOLS, REBECCA LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL *AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION/PROOF OF PUBLICATION *11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION/PROOF OF PUBLICATION *11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY (PC) action date changed to 11/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY (PC) set on 11/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION with a due date 12/18/2020 updated with compliance action of INVENTORY (PC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAMENDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCompliance Inventory (PR) has been created with due date of 2/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVOCE PF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION *JOYCE E MCLESKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS *11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPersonal Rep Attorney: REBECCA Lynn NICHOLS Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE *7/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $403.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $403.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CP000351PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLS, REBECCA LYNN