This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/15/2019 at 17:30:50 (UTC).

MCCOURT, JOHN FRANCIS, MCCOURT, MAURA TERESA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 MCCOURT, JOHN FRANCIS, MCCOURT, MAURA TERESA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MCCOURT, MAURA TERESA

MCCOURT, STEPHEN JOHN

Decedent

MCCOURT, JOHN FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOGAERT, JOY MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT * BERNARD JOSEPH MCCOURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Personal Rep Attorney: JOY MARIE BOGAERT Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Personal Rep Attorney: JOY MARIE BOGAERT Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $231.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * STEPHEN JOHN MCCOURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * MAURA TERESA MCCOURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE * JOHN FRANCIS MCCOURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE * ANNIE IMELDA MCCOURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • PETITION TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT WILL TO RECORD ACCORDING TO FLORIDA STATUTES 734.1025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Case 282019CP000244PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less