This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 10/14/2019 at 13:30:28 (UTC).

MCCOSKEY, MORRIS VS NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTI Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 MCCOSKEY, MORRIS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTI. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCOSKEY, MORRIS

Defendants

NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTI

SUN N LAKE OF SEBRING IMPROVEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKIPPER, JOCELYN K

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

12/31/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

EPORTAL RECEIPT

10/29/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SUN 'N LAKE OF SEBRING IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT

11/05/2019:ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SUN 'N LAKE OF SEBRING IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT

ALIAS SUMMONS

10/29/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES OF SUN 'N LAKES, LLC)

10/29/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES OF SUN 'N LAKES, LLC)

WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE (ATTY SCHUMACHER FOR SUN 'N LAKE OF SEBRING IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT)

10/15/2019:WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE (ATTY SCHUMACHER FOR SUN 'N LAKE OF SEBRING IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT)

NOTICE FROM SECRETARY OF STATE NATIONAL RECREATION PROPERTIES /ACCEPTED11/1/19 @ 4PM)

11/14/2019:NOTICE FROM SECRETARY OF STATE NATIONAL RECREATION PROPERTIES /ACCEPTED11/1/19 @ 4PM)

CONSENT TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE (SUN 'N LAKE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT)

12/04/2019:CONSENT TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE (SUN 'N LAKE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT)

FINAL JUDGMENT

01/28/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/28/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

12/18/2019:MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING (1/28/20 @ 10:00AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/18/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING (1/28/20 @ 10:00AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES SUN 'N LAKES LLC)

10/11/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES SUN 'N LAKES LLC)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

10/03/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/03/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

EPORTAL RECEIPT

09/23/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES OF SUN 'N LAKES LLC)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES OF SUN 'N LAKES LLC)

COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

09/20/2019:COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES SUN 'N LAKES LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 177789

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $5.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (NATIONAL RECREATIONAL PROPERTIES OF SUN 'N LAKES LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (SUN 'N LAKE OF SEBRING IMPROVEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 177147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case 282019CA000507GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKIPPER, JOCELYN K