This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/29/2019 at 17:31:57 (UTC).

MAYFIELD, IVO DON, THOMPSON, KENNETH L Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 MAYFIELD, IVO DON, THOMPSON, KENNETH L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Decedent

MAYFIELD, IVO DON

Not Classified By Court

THOMPSON, KENNETH L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

STONE, CHARLOTTE COMBS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 10/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 7/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Personal Rep Attorney: CHARLOTTE COMBS STONE Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • LAST WILL & TESTAMENT *2/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE *7/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174131

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Case 282019CP000357PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE CHARLOTTE COMBS