This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 20:31:51 (UTC).

MASSEY, BRITTANY LAUREN VS MASSEY, JASON A

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 MASSEY, BRITTANY LAUREN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MASSEY, JASON A. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE, KELLY BUTZ and BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

KELLY BUTZ

BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MASSEY, BRITTANY LAUREN

Respondent

MASSEY, JASON A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRO SE COURT on 11/16/2020 0215 PM Judge HEATHER BEATO results DISPOSED on 12/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL**JASON**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSELF HELP PROGRAM NOTICE COC- JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEvent PRO SE COURT scheduled on 11/16/2020 at 0215 PM, MX - Judge KELLY BUTZ presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING (VIRTUAL) 11/16/2020 @ 2:15PM

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020DR000681FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: BUTZ , KELLY PAIGE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less