This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/16/2021 at 17:33:11 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, ADA I, MARTINEZ, JOSE F Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 MARTINEZ, ADA I, MARTINEZ, JOSE F was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTINEZ, ADA I

Decedent

MARTINEZ, JOSE F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketWAIVER & CONSENT * CHRISTOPHER MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF BANK STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDISP OF PERS PROP W/O ADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 218788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $231.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CP000451PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT assigned

    Read MoreRead Less