This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 12/07/2022 at 17:02:15 (UTC).

MARTIN, DAVID, MARTIN, MARY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 MARTIN, DAVID, MARTIN, MARY L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTIN, MARY L

Decedent

MARTIN, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHAVERNAY, MARLA E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketJudge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 248309

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PAID FUNERAL BILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE *10/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 282022CP000627PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAVERNAY, MARLA