This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 12/19/2019 at 17:31:30 (UTC).

MANGES, JOAN BEVERLY, MANGES, MILTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MANGES, JOAN BEVERLY, MANGES, MILTON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MANGES, MILTON

Decedent

MANGES, JOAN BEVERLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • UPDATE DISPOSAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • ORDER DISPOSING PERSONAL PROPERTY W/O ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • COPY OF CHECKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DISP OF PERS PROP W/O ADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 181989

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $231.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case 282019CP000551PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.