This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/17/2019 at 17:31:06 (UTC).

LYNCH, SHIRLEY ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 LYNCH, SHIRLEY ELIZABETH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

LYNCH, SHIRLEY ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

BOYCE, DENNIS MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * SHIRLEY ELIZABETH LYNCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • COPY OF PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ORIGINAL RECORDED LAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ORIGINAL RECORDED DEATH CERTIFICATE 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • LAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (testate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169952

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Case 282019CP000249PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less