This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:58:24 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS PARISE, NANCY M

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PARISE, NANCY M. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PARISE, NANCY M

Sebring, FL 33870-2807

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

ORR, DAVID DYLAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/03/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/03/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (NANCY)

09/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (NANCY)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

09/03/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/03/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS SERVED 9/17/2021 (NANCY) IND

09/18/2021:SUMMONS SERVED 9/17/2021 (NANCY) IND

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (10/19/2021 @ 1:15 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

09/20/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (10/19/2021 @ 1:15 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (ATTY: DAVID D. ORR FOR DEFT)

10/14/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (ATTY: DAVID D. ORR FOR DEFT)

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - ATTORNEY'S REQUESTED CONTINUANCE PENDING INFORMAL SETTLEMENT

10/20/2021:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - ATTORNEY'S REQUESTED CONTINUANCE PENDING INFORMAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (12/14/2021 @ 1:15 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

12/05/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (12/14/2021 @ 1:15 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - JUDGE'S OFFICE TO SEND NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE FOR THIS CASE AND SP21-668 AND SP21-670 FOR 1 HOUR **COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY CSD**

12/15/2021:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - JUDGE'S OFFICE TO SEND NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE FOR THIS CASE AND SP21-668 AND SP21-670 FOR 1 HOUR **COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY CSD**

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/31/2021:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/24/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION

04/05/2022:NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 12/14/2021 0115 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 12/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - JUDGE'S OFFICE TO SEND NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE FOR THIS CASE AND SP21-668 AND SP21-670 FOR 1 HOUR **COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY CSD**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/14/2021 13:15; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua; Defendant Attorney: ORR, DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/14/2021 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: ORR, DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (12/14/2021 @ 1:15 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 12/14/2021 at 0115 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 10/19/2021 at 0100 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 217959

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase 282021SC000669SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/3/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORR DAVID