This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:37:26 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS GARNER, DAVID

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GARNER, DAVID. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GARNER, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELANSON, KYLE ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/10/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: KYLE MELANSON, ESQ. FOR PLTF)

08/10/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: KYLE MELANSON, ESQ. FOR PLTF)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

08/10/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/10/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DAVID)

08/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DAVID)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

08/10/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS SERVED 8/21/2021 (DAVID) SUB

08/25/2021:SUMMONS SERVED 8/21/2021 (DAVID) SUB

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (9/21/2021 @ 1:45 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

09/09/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (9/21/2021 @ 1:45 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL ****PROPOSED****

09/16/2021:STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL ****PROPOSED****

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/21/2021 13:45; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/21/2021 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL ****PROPOSED****

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 9/21/2021 0145 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 9/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (9/21/2021 @ 1:45 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 8/21/2021 (DAVID) SUB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 8/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 9/21/2021 at 0145 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 9/21/2021 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESET (CC/SC) on 8/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: KYLE MELANSON, ESQ. FOR PLTF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 216536

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase 282021SC000607SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melanson, Kyle Robert