This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/01/2019 at 16:31:47 (UTC).

LUGO, SARA V VS RODRIGUEZ, LUIS A

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 LUGO, SARA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VS RODRIGUEZ, LUIS A. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McDANIEL, MICHAEL P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McDANIEL, MICHAEL P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUGO, SARA V

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ, LUIS A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DE LA MAR, JORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Respondent Attorney: JORGE DE LA MAR Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • ANSWER TO WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY DE LA MAR FOR THE HUSBAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (ATTY DE LA MAR FOR THE HUSBAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • SUMMONS SERVED**INDIVIDUAL**05-10-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 168901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $4.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE W/PROPERTY BUT NO CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • CLERK'S DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENCY APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • PRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Case 282019DR000454FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Judge: McDANIEL , MICHAEL P assigned

    Read MoreRead Less