This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 16:31:59 (UTC).

LOVETT, RACHEL ELISHA

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 LOVETT, RACHEL ELISHA was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are McDANIEL, MICHAEL P and MICHAEL McDANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

McDANIEL, MICHAEL P

MICHAEL McDANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOVETT, RACHEL ELISHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • ORDER RE-SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Event PRO SE COURT scheduled on 7/12/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MICHAEL McDANIEL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Updated Event PRO SE COURT on 9/26/2019 0945 AM Judge MICHAEL McDANIEL results RESCHEDULED on 6/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Event PRO SE COURT scheduled on 7/12/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MICHAEL McDANIEL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Event PRO SE COURT scheduled on 9/26/2019 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge MICHAEL McDANIEL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING 09/26/2019 @9:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT SUBMITTED (3 copies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • FINGERPRINTS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 282019DR000533FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Judge: McDANIEL , MICHAEL P assigned

    Read MoreRead Less