This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 23:32:13 (UTC).

LOUX, MARGARET F, MOSBY, ROBERT T Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 LOUX, MARGARET F, MOSBY, ROBERT T was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

MOSBY, ROBERT T

Decedent

LOUX, MARGARET F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BOGAERT, JOY MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCompliance Inventory (PR) has been created with due date of 2/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketORG PROOF OF PUBLICATION 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS *10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCompliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 12/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT *9/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT *MARC A MOSBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE *8/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197539

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CP000349PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOGAERT, JOY MARIE