This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/13/2019 at 15:31:12 (UTC).

LONG'S AIR CONDITIONING INC VS GILLER, ROBERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 LONG'S AIR CONDITIONING INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GILLER, ROBERT. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY, ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG'S AIR CONDITIONING INC

Defendants

GILLER, TERESA

GILLER, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/23/2019 (ROBERT) IND

05/29/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/23/2019 (ROBERT) IND

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/23/2019 (TERESA) SUB

05/29/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/23/2019 (TERESA) SUB

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/20/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

RECEIPT MX 169724

05/20/2019:RECEIPT MX 169724

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY AG (ROBERT)

05/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY AG (ROBERT)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY AG (TERESA)

05/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY AG (TERESA)

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST CALCULATION

05/20/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST CALCULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/23/2019 (ROBERT) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/23/2019 (TERESA) SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 5/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT MX 169724

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY AG (ROBERT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY AG (TERESA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST CALCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169724

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $100.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 7/9/2019 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $100.00 Balance Remaining $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case 282019SC000329SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Event Date: 07/09/2019 13:00:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: MX COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less