This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/25/2019 at 17:30:58 (UTC).

LEWIS, STEPHANIE, WILLIAMSON, DONALD RAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 LEWIS, STEPHANIE, WILLIAMSON, DONALD RAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Decedent

WILLIAMSON, DONALD RAY

Not Classified By Court

LEWIS, STEPHANIE

WILLIAMSON, ROANEKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HINES, ROBERT D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • OBJECTION TO THE APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 6/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 06/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FORMAL NOTICE - ROANEKA WILLIAMSON, SHIMAREA HALL, DANTE WALKER AND LEVIN GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING * PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * STEPHANIE LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • PETITION FOR ESTABLISHMENT AND PROBATE OF LOST OR DESTROYED WILL AND MEMORANDUM DISPOSING OF TANGIBLE PERSONAL PROPERTY AN APPOINTMENT OF REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 173862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Case 282019CP000348PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, ROBERT D.