This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 17:31:09 (UTC).

JOHNSON, MYRA JO, VANWY, JERRY A Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 JOHNSON, MYRA JO, VANWY, JERRY A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON, MYRA JO

VANWY, MYRON JEFFREY

VANWY, JERRY A

Decedent

VANWY, MYRON JAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KEIBER, MICHAEL LANCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 8/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 04/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVE BOND * MYRON JEFFREY VANWY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVE BOND * JERRY VANWY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * MYRA JO JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170076

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 282019CP000254PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less