This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/26/2019 at 17:31:22 (UTC).

JOHNSON, EULAR HOBBS, WHITE, DEMETRIOUS Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 JOHNSON, EULAR HOBBS, WHITE, DEMETRIOUS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

WHITE, DEMETRIOUS

WHITE, IDELLA

Decedent

JOHNSON, EULAR HOBBS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LIVINGSTON, ROBERT EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 1/24/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Petitioner Attorney: ROBERT EDWARD LIVINGSTON Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING * DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * IDELLA WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • JOINDER, AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION * DEMETRIOUS WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • LAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM GREATER THAN $1,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 01/24/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 173973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Case 282019CP000351PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIVINGSTON, ROBERT EDWARD