This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 03/22/2019 at 01:05:52 (UTC).

JOHNSON, CLEM VS ESTATE OF GIRARD MCKENZIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2015 JOHNSON, CLEM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESTATE OF GIRARD MCKENZIE. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RAIDEN, MICHAEL E, MICHAEL RAIDEN, PETER ESTRADA and ESTRADA, PETER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RAIDEN, MICHAEL E

MICHAEL RAIDEN

PETER ESTRADA

ESTRADA, PETER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, CLEM

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

ESTATE OF GIRARD MCKENZIE

MCKENZIE, GIRARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRSCHNER, STEVEN JAY

Defendant Attorneys

TURNER, SCOTT ALLEN

PECARO, PAUL R

 

Court Documents

DEF, THE ESTATE OF GIRARD MCKENZIE'S NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY AT MEDIATION

05/02/2017:DEF, THE ESTATE OF GIRARD MCKENZIE'S NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY AT MEDIATION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/06/2017:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PRE-MEDIATION REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF

03/06/2017:REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PRE-MEDIATION REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF

REQUEST FOR COPIES of CME Report by Dr Shim.

02/27/2017:REQUEST FOR COPIES of CME Report by Dr Shim.

DEF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/17/2017:DEF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFT'S AMD CROSS-RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS / CLEM JOHNSON @ 10:30 AM ON 02/15/17 & DORCIA JOHNSON @ 1:30 PM ON 02/15/17

10/21/2016:DEFT'S AMD CROSS-RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS / CLEM JOHNSON @ 10:30 AM ON 02/15/17 & DORCIA JOHNSON @ 1:30 PM ON 02/15/17

DEF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/26/2016:DEF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF HEARING (9/8/2016 @ 3:00 PM- PLTF'S OBJECTION TO DEF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE)

07/13/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING (9/8/2016 @ 3:00 PM- PLTF'S OBJECTION TO DEF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE)

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/14/2016:REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/19/2016:DEF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/REQUEST FOR COPIES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY (STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS COMP)

03/09/2016:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY (STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS COMP)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (ATTY KIRSCHNER)

10/27/2015:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (ATTY KIRSCHNER)

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION - 08/25/15 (DORCIA JOHNSON)

08/24/2015:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION - 08/25/15 (DORCIA JOHNSON)

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (MRC/DR STEWART - ETC)

08/18/2015:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (MRC/DR STEWART - ETC)

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON 6/23/2015 (BILLING CUSTODIAN LEADING EDGE PHYS THERAPY) CORP

07/10/2015:SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON 6/23/2015 (BILLING CUSTODIAN LEADING EDGE PHYS THERAPY) CORP

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON 6/23/2015 (MED R/C CENTRAL FL HEALTH CLINICS) CORP

07/09/2015:SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON 6/23/2015 (MED R/C CENTRAL FL HEALTH CLINICS) CORP

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON 6/24/2015 (DR CAROLYN PASS C/O BILLING CUSTODIAN) R/C

07/09/2015:SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON 6/24/2015 (DR CAROLYN PASS C/O BILLING CUSTODIAN) R/C

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/20/2015:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

317 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ATTY'S CHARGING LIEN AND W/DRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (6/27/2017 @ 9:30 AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (6/27/2017 @ 9:30 AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (W/PREJUDICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (5/30/2017 @ 10:00 AM- PLTF'S MOTION TO W/DRAW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Case Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Updated Event CIRCIVH on 6/27/2017 0930 AM Judge MICHAEL RAIDEN results CANCELLED on 5/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Updated Event CIRCIVH on 5/30/2017 1000 AM Judge MICHAEL RAIDEN results CANCELLED on 5/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
339 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2015
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 80563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Plaintiff Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Case 282015CA000186GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Event Date: 06/27/2017 09:30:00; Judge: RAIDEN, MICHAEL E; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: MX HEARIN; Defendant Attorney: Pecaro, Paul R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Event Date: 05/30/2017 10:00:00; Judge: RAIDEN, MICHAEL E; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: MX HEARIN; Defendant Attorney: Pecaro, Paul R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Event Date: 09/08/2016 14:30:00; Judge: RAIDEN, MICHAEL E; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: MX HEARIN; Defendant Attorney: Pecaro, Paul R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Event Date: 01/25/2016 13:30:00; Judge: RAIDEN, MICHAEL E; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: MX HEARIN; Defendant Attorney: Pecaro, Paul R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Event Date: 08/20/2015 10:15:00; Judge: RAIDEN, MICHAEL E; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: MX HEARIN; Defendant Attorney: Pecaro, Paul R

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant