This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:04:10 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS MURPHY, KENNETH

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MURPHY, KENNETH. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

MURPHY, KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

06/19/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL COURT DATE FROM 3/24/20 @ 1PM AND 6/23/20 @ 1PM TO (SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 @ 2:50 PM)

06/18/2020:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL COURT DATE FROM 3/24/20 @ 1PM AND 6/23/20 @ 1PM TO (SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 @ 2:50 PM)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL DATE BASED ON SUPREME COURT'S ISSUANCE OF AOSC20-15 (6/23/2020 @ 1:00 PM)

03/18/2020:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL DATE BASED ON SUPREME COURT'S ISSUANCE OF AOSC20-15 (6/23/2020 @ 1:00 PM)

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM (ATTY AARON REPRESENTED PLTF/DEFT APPEARED / CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE TO 3/24/20 @ 1PM TO ALLOW TIME FOR DEBT CONSOLIDATION RECONCILIATION / THIS IS ONLY NOTICE)

01/28/2020:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM (ATTY AARON REPRESENTED PLTF/DEFT APPEARED / CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE TO 3/24/20 @ 1PM TO ALLOW TIME FOR DEBT CONSOLIDATION RECONCILIATION / THIS IS ONLY NOTICE)

SUMMONS SERVED 12/30/19 (KENNETH) IND

12/31/2019:SUMMONS SERVED 12/30/19 (KENNETH) IND

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (KENNETH)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (KENNETH)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/22/2020 14:50; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/23/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 9/22/2020 0250 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 6/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL COURT DATE FROM 3/24/20 @ 1PM AND 6/23/20 @ 1PM TO (SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 @ 2:50 PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 9/22/2020 at 0250 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 6/23/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESCHEDULED on 6/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/24/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL DATE BASED ON SUPREME COURT'S ISSUANCE OF AOSC20-15 (6/23/2020 @ 1:00 PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000817SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less