This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:02:27 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS ESPINOZA, ELENA

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESPINOZA, ELENA. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

ESPINOZA, ELENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ELENA)

01/22/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ELENA)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ELENA)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ELENA)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/28/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 1/28/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ELENA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ELENA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 1/28/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182909

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000814SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less