This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/14/2019 at 19:30:33 (UTC).

HORN, KENNETH LEE, STATE OF FLORIDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 HORN, KENNETH LEE, STATE OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ESTRADA, PETER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ESTRADA, PETER

 

Party Details

Appellant

HORN, KENNETH LEE

Appellee

STATE OF FLORIDA

 

Court Documents

SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: THIS WILL PROCEED AS A SUMMARY APPEAL

06/04/2019:SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: THIS WILL PROCEED AS A SUMMARY APPEAL

ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT 92D 19-2096)

06/04/2019:ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT 92D 19-2096)

NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

05/31/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

BELATED SUMMARY APPEAL RECORD SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE DEFENDANT

05/31/2019:BELATED SUMMARY APPEAL RECORD SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE DEFENDANT

SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: PETITION FOR BELATED APPEAL IS GRANTED. CERTIFY AND RETURN (READ)

05/15/2019:SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: PETITION FOR BELATED APPEAL IS GRANTED. CERTIFY AND RETURN (READ)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Agency Case Number modified: 2D 19-2096

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Agency Case Number modified: 2D 19-744

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: THIS WILL PROCEED AS A SUMMARY APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT 92D 19-2096)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BELATED SUMMARY APPEAL RECORD SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • BELATED SUMMARY APPEAL PACKAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: PETITION FOR BELATED APPEAL IS GRANTED. CERTIFY AND RETURN (READ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Prosecutor: ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Judge: ESTRADA , PETER Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • State Attorney Case Number modified: CF 09-168

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Case 282019AP000024APAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less