This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 16:31:47 (UTC).

HOLTON, KATELYNN D VS HOLTON, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 HOLTON, KATELYNN D filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HOLTON, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE and KELLY BUTZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

KELLY BUTZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOLTON, KATELYNN D

Respondent

HOLTON, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

COPLEY, ALISON B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event DV COURT on 10/1/2020 0830 AM Judge KELLY BUTZ results DISPOSED on 10/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (AFTER HEARING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketRespondent Attorney: ALISON COPLEY Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPEONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED 9/18/20 @ 1407

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMEMO FOR SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketTEMP INJUNCTION WITH CHILDREN / NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT(INJUNCTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketActive Process Order To Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketEvent DV COURT scheduled on 10/1/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge KELLY BUTZ presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 282020DR000679FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: BUTZ , KELLY PAIGE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less