This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/09/2019 at 19:30:22 (UTC).

HOLDER, WALTER LEE JR, STATE OF FLORIDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 HOLDER, WALTER LEE JR, STATE OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ESTRADA, PETER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ESTRADA, PETER

 

Party Details

Appellant

HOLDER, WALTER LEE JR

Appellee

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

DIMMIG, HOWARD L

 

Court Documents

APPEAL RECORD (2D 19-2071) SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

06/03/2019:APPEAL RECORD (2D 19-2071) SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT (2D 19-2071)

06/03/2019:ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT (2D 19-2071)

NOTICE OF APPEAL PLEADINGS SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL THE PUBLIC DEFENDER AND E.C.R.

05/31/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL PLEADINGS SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL THE PUBLIC DEFENDER AND E.C.R.

NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

05/31/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPT PUBLIC DEFENDER (FOR APPEAL PURPOSES)

04/02/2019:PROVISIONAL ORDER APPT PUBLIC DEFENDER (FOR APPEAL PURPOSES)

DESIGNATIONS TO THE COURT REPORTER (CROSS)

05/10/2019:DESIGNATIONS TO THE COURT REPORTER (CROSS)

DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

05/10/2019:DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

STATEMENT JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED

05/10/2019:STATEMENT JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

05/10/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • APPEAL PACKAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEAL RECORD (2D 19-2071) SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Agency Case Number modified: 2D 19-2071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT (2D 19-2071)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL PLEADINGS SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL THE PUBLIC DEFENDER AND E.C.R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATIONS TO THE COURT REPORTER (CROSS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Prosecutor: ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Judge: ESTRADA , PETER Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • State Attorney Case Number modified: CF 16-1052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Case 282019AP000022APAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Appellant Attorney: HOWARD L DIMMIG Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROVISIONAL ORDER APPT PUBLIC DEFENDER (FOR APPEAL PURPOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less