This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 09/07/2019 at 17:30:57 (UTC).

HINMAN, MARILYN W, STEPHENS, DAVID R Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 HINMAN, MARILYN W, STEPHENS, DAVID R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Claimant

TRANSITIONS NOW, LLC.

Not Classified By Court

STEPHENS, DAVID R

Decedent

HINMAN, MARILYN W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM * TRANSITIONS NOW - KATHY MASLOVARIC $1,092.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 175894

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $3.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * DAVID R. STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174842

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * DAVID R. STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * DAVID R. STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Case 282019CP000368PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT