This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 19:30:26 (UTC).

HARRELL, LARRY STEVEN, STATE OF FLORIDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 HARRELL, LARRY STEVEN, STATE OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ESTRADA, PETER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ESTRADA, PETER

 

Party Details

Appellant

HARRELL, LARRY STEVEN

Appellee

STATE OF FLORIDA

 

Court Documents

SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: THIS WILL PROCEED AS A SUMMARY APPEAL

06/03/2019:SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: THIS WILL PROCEED AS A SUMMARY APPEAL

ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT (2D 19-2076)

06/03/2019:ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT (2D 19-2076)

SUMMARY APPEAL RECORD SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE DEFENDANT

05/31/2019:SUMMARY APPEAL RECORD SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

05/31/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

05/23/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • Agency Case Number modified: 2D 19-2076

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS ORDER: THIS WILL PROCEED AS A SUMMARY APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM DISTRICT COURT (2D 19-2076)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY APPEAL RECORD SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL AND THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • SUMMARY APPEAL PACKAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Prosecutor: ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Judge: ESTRADA , PETER Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • State Attorney Case Number modified: CF 17-1135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Case 282019AP000026APAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less