This case was last updated from Highlands County - Tenth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/02/2022 at 05:49:29 (UTC).

HARE, CRYSTAL Et Al VS EMERALD COAST RV CENTER LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 HARE, CRYSTAL filed an Other lawsuit against EMERALD COAST RV CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Highlands County - Tenth Judicial Circuit Court, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARE, CRYSTAL

HENRY, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

EMERALD COAST RV CENTER LLC

HEARTLAND RECREATIONAL VEHICLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN, ANTONIO GIOVONNIE

Defendant Attorney

DAHL, PATRICK K

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

01/28/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE (ATTY MALDONADO FOR PLTFS)

01/12/2022:NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE (ATTY MALDONADO FOR PLTFS)

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (ATTY PATRICK DAHL FOR DEFS HEARTLAND RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, LLC AND EMERALD COAST RV CENTER, LLC)

01/10/2022:STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (ATTY PATRICK DAHL FOR DEFS HEARTLAND RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, LLC AND EMERALD COAST RV CENTER, LLC)

NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL APPEARANCE (PATRICK DAHL FOR DEFT)

01/06/2022:NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL APPEARANCE (PATRICK DAHL FOR DEFT)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (1/19/22 TO 4/20/22) ATTY ANTONIO MARTIN

01/04/2022:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (1/19/22 TO 4/20/22) ATTY ANTONIO MARTIN

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (ATTY ANTONIO MARTIN)

01/04/2022:MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (ATTY ANTONIO MARTIN)

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM (1/18/22 @ 9:30AM)

12/15/2021:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM (1/18/22 @ 9:30AM)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE (ATTY MALDONADO FOR PLTFS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (ATTY PATRICK DAHL FOR DEFS HEARTLAND RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, LLC AND EMERALD COAST RV CENTER, LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADDITIONAL APPEARANCE (PATRICK DAHL FOR DEFT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (1/19/22 TO 4/20/22) ATTY ANTONIO MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (ATTY ANTONIO MARTIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM (1/18/22 @ 9:30AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: Patrick K Dahl Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAMPING WORLD'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 218627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CA000296GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERLAD COAST RV CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK DAHL