This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 09/08/2019 at 17:30:15 (UTC).

HANSEN, BARBARA MARIE, HANSEN, JAMES ROBERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 HANSEN, BARBARA MARIE, HANSEN, JAMES ROBERT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

HANSEN, JAMES ROBERT

Decedent

HANSEN, BARBARA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

KABBOORD, JOHN JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 10/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * JAMES ROBERT HANSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 175261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $12.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND * ROBIN LEE HUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * JAMES ROBERT HANSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * JAMES ROBERT HANSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174946

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Case 282019CP000370PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KABBOORD JOHN J JR