This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 12/28/2020 at 19:53:25 (UTC).

HALL, SHANE VS DELGADO, ORLANDO REY DIVILA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 HALL, SHANE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DELGADO, ORLANDO REY DIVILA. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALL, SHANE

Defendants

SANTIAGO, ASHLEY M ROSCIO

DELGADO, ORLANDO REY DIVILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CELAYA, ROBERTO PABLO

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION

11/19/2020:ORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS - ORIGINAL

11/17/2020:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS - ORIGINAL

EMAIL (sent / received) PLAINTIFF PROVIDED MOTION TO DISMISS VIA EMAIL - CLERK FORWARDED COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE

11/17/2020:EMAIL (sent / received) PLAINTIFF PROVIDED MOTION TO DISMISS VIA EMAIL - CLERK FORWARDED COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE

PLTF'S MOTION TO DISMISS (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY CSD)

11/17/2020:PLTF'S MOTION TO DISMISS (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY CSD)

NOTICE OF HEARING (11/16/2020 @ 3:45 PM) - DEFT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

11/09/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (11/16/2020 @ 3:45 PM) - DEFT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

10/30/2020:PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (ATTY: ROBERTO P. CELAYA FOR DEFT'S)

10/20/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (ATTY: ROBERTO P. CELAYA FOR DEFT'S)

PAPERWORK FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGER

10/06/2020:PAPERWORK FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGER

DEFT' MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

10/08/2020:DEFT' MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S BASKET WITH PROPOSED JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER BY CKW)

10/06/2020:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S BASKET WITH PROPOSED JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER BY CKW)

ANSWER WITH RENT RECEIPTS ATTACHED (ASHLEY SANTIAGO)

10/01/2020:ANSWER WITH RENT RECEIPTS ATTACHED (ASHLEY SANTIAGO)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/23/2020 (ORLANDO) SUB

09/28/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/23/2020 (ORLANDO) SUB

SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/23/2020 (AHSLEY) IND

09/28/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/23/2020 (AHSLEY) IND

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROPERTY MANAGER BY BP (ASHLEY)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROPERTY MANAGER BY BP (ASHLEY)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROPERTY MANAGER BY BP (ORLANDO)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROPERTY MANAGER BY BP (ORLANDO)

AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

09/21/2020:AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

3 - DAY NOTICE

09/21/2020:3 - DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

09/21/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event CCH on 11/16/2020 0345 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 11/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS - ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL (sent / received) PLAINTIFF PROVIDED MOTION TO DISMISS VIA EMAIL - CLERK FORWARDED COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF'S MOTION TO DISMISS (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY CSD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/16/2020 15:45; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: CCH; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CELAYA, ROBERTO P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/16/2020 15:45; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: CCH; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CELAYA, ROBERTO P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (11/16/2020 @ 3:45 PM) - DEFT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEvent CCH scheduled on 11/16/2020 at 0345 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PROPERTY MANAGER BY BP (ASHLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PROPERTY MANAGER BY BP (ORLANDO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3 - DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CC000354CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) assigned

    Read MoreRead Less