This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/06/2019 at 17:31:53 (UTC).

HALEY, KATHY, KACKLEY, DOROTHY JEAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 HALEY, KATHY, KACKLEY, DOROTHY JEAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HALEY, KATHY

Decedent

KACKLEY, DOROTHY JEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DISP OF PERS PROP W/O ADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • CONSENT & WAIVER * SHARON CULVERHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • CONSENT & WAIVER * STEVE KACKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • CONSENT & WAIVER * SANDRA YORK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • CONSENT & WAIVER * SHELIA PECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169209

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $231.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • COPY OF INSURANCE CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 08/29/2017 (recorded)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DISP OF PERS PROP W/O ADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case 282019CP000231PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less