This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 05/02/2022 at 06:26:10 (UTC).

FRANCIS, ROBERT VS CITY OF AVON PARK Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 FRANCIS, ROBERT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITY OF AVON PARK. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COWDEN, ANGELA JANE and ANGELA COWDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

ANGELA COWDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCIS, ROBERT

Defendants

ITWARU, BHRGU CHAKRAVARTI

CITY OF AVON PARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

MEYER, LOUIS PAUL

 

Court Documents

CITY OF AVON PARK'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

04/05/2022:CITY OF AVON PARK'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

NOTICE OF HEARING VIRTUAL VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS (4/25/22 @ 1:30 PM) -MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/18/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING VIRTUAL VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS (4/25/22 @ 1:30 PM) -MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

02/18/2022:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

AMENDED MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (BHRGU ITWARU ONLY)

02/04/2022:AMENDED MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (BHRGU ITWARU ONLY)

AMENDED DEFAULT BY CLERK OF COURT **BHRGU ITWARU ONLY**

02/03/2022:AMENDED DEFAULT BY CLERK OF COURT **BHRGU ITWARU ONLY**

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK **AS TO BHRGU ITWARU ONLY**

02/03/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK **AS TO BHRGU ITWARU ONLY**

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

02/03/2022:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

ANSWER OF DEFEDNANT, CITY OF AVON PARK

01/27/2022:ANSWER OF DEFEDNANT, CITY OF AVON PARK

PROPOSED DEFAULT **CITY OF OF AVON PARK HAS FILED A MOTION ON 12/28/2021***

01/25/2022:PROPOSED DEFAULT **CITY OF OF AVON PARK HAS FILED A MOTION ON 12/28/2021***

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ***CITY OF OF AVON PARK HAS FILED A MOTION ON 12/28/2021***

01/25/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ***CITY OF OF AVON PARK HAS FILED A MOTION ON 12/28/2021***

ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

01/12/2022:ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SUMMONS SERVED 12/23/21 (BHRGU ITWARU) IND

01/05/2022:SUMMONS SERVED 12/23/21 (BHRGU ITWARU) IND

SUMMONS SERVED 12/27/21 (CITY MANAGER MARK SCHRADER) REG AGENT

01/05/2022:SUMMONS SERVED 12/27/21 (CITY MANAGER MARK SCHRADER) REG AGENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE (BHRGU ITWARU)

01/04/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE (BHRGU ITWARU)

ORDER ON DEF'S, CITY OF AVON PARK, UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

12/28/2021:ORDER ON DEF'S, CITY OF AVON PARK, UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

DEFS, CITY OF AVON PARK, UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

12/28/2021:DEFS, CITY OF AVON PARK, UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (BHRGU ITWARU)

12/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (BHRGU ITWARU)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (CITY OF AVON PARK)

12/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (CITY OF AVON PARK)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/25/2022 13:30; Judge: COWDEN, ANGELA JANE; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua; Defendant Attorney: Meyer, Louis P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITY OF AVON PARK'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • DocketEvent CIRCIVH scheduled on 4/25/2022 at 0130 PM, VC - Judge ANGELA COWDEN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIRTUAL VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS (4/25/22 @ 1:30 PM) -MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (BHRGU ITWARU ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED DEFAULT BY CLERK OF COURT **BHRGU ITWARU ONLY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK **AS TO BHRGU ITWARU ONLY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFEDNANT, CITY OF AVON PARK

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 224575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $429.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $429.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CA000432GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF AVON PARK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER , LOUIS PAUL