This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 10/07/2019 at 13:31:14 (UTC).

FRANCIS I COOPERATIVE ASSOCIAT VS MOORE, TERRY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 FRANCIS I COOPERATIVE ASSOCIAT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MOORE, TERRY L. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCIS I COOPERATIVE ASSOCIAT

Defendants

UNKNOWN TEANT 1

MOORE, TERRY L

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAVEZ, PAMELA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN

06/25/2021:SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 4/28/2021 @ 11:00AM) - ORIGINAL

04/26/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 4/28/2021 @ 11:00AM) - ORIGINAL

ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE

04/26/2021:ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE

PLTF'S MOTION TO CANCEL THE SALE SCHEDULED ON APRIL 28, 2021

04/26/2021:PLTF'S MOTION TO CANCEL THE SALE SCHEDULED ON APRIL 28, 2021

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO SUSPEND FORECLOSURE (4/26/21 @ 1:30PM)

04/23/2021:ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO SUSPEND FORECLOSURE (4/26/21 @ 1:30PM)

DEF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO SUSPEND FORECLOSURE SALE (PLACED IN JUDGE'S BASKET AND FORWARD ELECTRONICALLY BY CKW)

04/22/2021:DEF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO SUSPEND FORECLOSURE SALE (PLACED IN JUDGE'S BASKET AND FORWARD ELECTRONICALLY BY CKW)

NOTICE OF HEARING (2/22/21 @ 9:30AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/05/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING (2/22/21 @ 9:30AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR ALL PARTIES (1/6/21 @ 9:30AM)

12/04/2020:ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR ALL PARTIES (1/6/21 @ 9:30AM)

PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

12/21/2020:PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

ANSWER (TERRY)

02/25/2020:ANSWER (TERRY)

ORDER CANCELLING CMC ON JANUARY 6, 2021

01/04/2021:ORDER CANCELLING CMC ON JANUARY 6, 2021

PLTF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK TENANT #1; UNK TENANTT #2)

12/21/2020:PLTF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK TENANT #1; UNK TENANTT #2)

PLTF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/6/2021

12/30/2020:PLTF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/6/2021

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW)

02/24/2021:NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/13/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

09/13/2019:COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (TERRY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 176739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $435.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Case 282019CA000489GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAMELA CHAVEZ