This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 10/07/2019 at 13:31:40 (UTC).

FRANCIS I COOPERATIVE ASSOCIAT VS FASHBAUGH, DENISE L Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 FRANCIS I COOPERATIVE ASSOCIAT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FASHBAUGH, DENISE L. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCIS I COOPERATIVE ASSOCIAT

Defendants

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT NO 1

FASHBAUGH, DENISE L

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT NO 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAVEZ, PAMELA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (ATTY CHAVEZ)

06/25/2021:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (ATTY CHAVEZ)

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO FINANCE BY CSD - NO ENVS PROVIDED FOR PARTIES)

06/24/2021:CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO FINANCE BY CSD - NO ENVS PROVIDED FOR PARTIES)

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (NO ENVS PROVIDED) BY CKW

06/24/2021:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (NO ENVS PROVIDED) BY CKW

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 6/09/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - HARD COPY

06/17/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 6/09/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - HARD COPY

SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

06/10/2021:SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

FUNDS DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY OF COURT ($18,000.00)

06/09/2021:FUNDS DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY OF COURT ($18,000.00)

$70 - SALE FEE

06/09/2021:$70 - SALE FEE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

06/09/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

BID SHEET ($18,000/INSTANT TITLE SEARCH LLC)

06/09/2021:BID SHEET ($18,000/INSTANT TITLE SEARCH LLC)

INTENT TO BID FORM ***SUCCESSFUL THIRD PARTY BIDDER***

06/09/2021:INTENT TO BID FORM ***SUCCESSFUL THIRD PARTY BIDDER***

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 6/9/2021)

06/09/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 6/9/2021)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE - 6/9/21 @ 11:00AM) EMAIL

06/08/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE - 6/9/21 @ 11:00AM) EMAIL

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AFTER DEFAULT AND FOR ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS

01/12/2021:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AFTER DEFAULT AND FOR ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING PLTF'S AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

01/12/2021:NOTICE OF FILING PLTF'S AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY PLTF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK OCCUPANT #1; UNK OCCUPANT #2)

01/12/2021:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY PLTF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK OCCUPANT #1; UNK OCCUPANT #2)

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

04/01/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

03/11/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE (DENISE)

03/11/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE (DENISE)

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK OCCUPANT #2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK OCCUPANT #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (DENISE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 176740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $435.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Case 282019CA000490GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAMELA CHAVEZ