This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 11/11/2021 at 13:35:29 (UTC).

FLORIDA DREAM LANDS LLC VS GONZALEZ, OMAYRA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 FLORIDA DREAM LANDS LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GONZALEZ, OMAYRA. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA DREAM LANDS LLC

Defendant

GONZALEZ, OMAYRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 12/10/21

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 12/10/21

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (OMAYRA GONZALEZ)

11/08/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (OMAYRA GONZALEZ)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (OMAYRA)

11/01/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (OMAYRA)

EPOTAL RECEIPT

10/13/2021:EPOTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (OMAYRA GONZALEZ)

10/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (OMAYRA GONZALEZ)

COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

10/12/2021:COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/12/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/12/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/12/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 12/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (OMAYRA GONZALEZ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (OMAYRA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPOTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (OMAYRA GONZALEZ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 220432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $419.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $419.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CA000331GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER