This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 05/02/2022 at 06:05:46 (UTC).

FLORIDA DREAM LANDS LLC VS COLON, JOSE MANUEL FIGUEROA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 FLORIDA DREAM LANDS LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COLON, JOSE MANUEL FIGUEROA. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANGELA COWDEN and COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANGELA COWDEN

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA DREAM LANDS LLC

Defendant

COLON, JOSE MANUEL FIGUEROA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/12/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

10/12/2021:COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/12/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (JOSE MANUEL FIGUEROA COLON)

10/15/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (JOSE MANUEL FIGUEROA COLON)

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

10/15/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ELECTRONICALLY TO NEWS SUN BY CKW (DEFAULT DATE: 11/17/21)

10/15/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ELECTRONICALLY TO NEWS SUN BY CKW (DEFAULT DATE: 11/17/21)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/19/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PROPOSED DEFAULT

11/19/2021:PROPOSED DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JOSE)

11/19/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JOSE)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (JOSE)

11/22/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (JOSE)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION - DEFAULT DATE: 11/17/2021) - HARD COPY

11/23/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION - DEFAULT DATE: 11/17/2021) - HARD COPY

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT

11/29/2021:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT

NOTICE OF HEARING (12/03/2021 @ 10:15 AM) - MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT FILED ON 11/29/2021

11/30/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING (12/03/2021 @ 10:15 AM) - MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT FILED ON 11/29/2021

FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT

12/03/2021:FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/03/2021 10:15; Judge: COWDEN, ANGELA JANE; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event CIRCIVH on 12/3/2021 1015 AM Judge ANGELA COWDEN results HEARING COMPLETED on 12/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (12/03/2021 @ 10:15 AM) - MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT FILED ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent CIRCIVH scheduled on 12/3/2021 at 1015 AM, VC - Judge ANGELA COWDEN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION - DEFAULT DATE: 11/17/2021) - HARD COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (JOSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JOSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 220436

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $409.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CA000334GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER