This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 09/09/2019 at 17:34:05 (UTC).

FINGER, TRACY LYNNE, JONES, CORY ROBERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 FINGER, TRACY LYNNE, JONES, CORY ROBERT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

JONES, LAURIE ANN

Claimants

BANK OF AMERICA

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Not Classified By Court

FINGER, TRACY LYNNE

JONES, CORY ROBERT

JONES, SHARI ANN

JONES, LAURIE ANN

Decedent

JONES, LEWIS WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

BREWER, JAMES COLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • Estate Claim for $5,112.79

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM * BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. $5,112.79

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS *8/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT *ELECTION OF SURVIVING SPOUSE TO TAKE A ONE-HALF INTEREST OF DECEDENT'S INTEREST IN HOMESTEAD PROPERTY (REDOCKETED TO SHOW FILE NUMBER *NOTARY SEAL IS COVERING THE ELECRONICALLY FILED INFORMATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT *ELECTION OF SURVIVING SPOUSE TO TAKE A ONE-HALF INTEREST OF DECEDENT'S INTEREST IN HOMESTEAD PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • PERSONAL REPRESENATIVES NOTICE OF ELECTION TO TAKE ELECTIVE SHARE *CORY ROBERT JONES, TRACY LYNNE FINGER, SHARI ANN JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • ELECTION OF SURVIVING SPOUSE TO TAKE A ONE-HALF INTEREST OF DECEDENT'S INTEREST IN HOMESTEAD PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVE BOND * TRACY LYNNE FINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVE BOND * SHARI ANN JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVE BOND * CORY ROBERT JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * LAURIE ANN JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (intestate Florida resident - single petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 175052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Case 282019CP000372PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREWER, JAMES COLE