This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 07:07:25 (UTC).

FELBER, JOYCE, PARKER, CURTIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 FELBER, JOYCE, PARKER, CURTIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COWDEN, ANGELA J and COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COWDEN, ANGELA J

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

PARKER, CURTIS

Decedent

FELBER, JOYCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

DISLER, MICHAEL M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL PROOF OF PUBLICATION 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION/AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION *12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS *12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE* CURTIS M. PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 11/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * CURTIS M. PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE 11/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM GREATER THAN $1,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING * DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 181986

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 282019CP000550PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less