This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/29/2019 at 17:31:08 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MIKKY ROBINSON, NAHAR, TERRY S Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 ESTATE OF MIKKY ROBINSON, NAHAR, TERRY S was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

NAHAR, TERRY S

ESTATE OF MIKKY ROBINSON

TUCIBAT, GINGER

Decedent

ROBINSON, BONNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LIVINGSTON, ROBERT EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 175047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $12.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 2/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND *GINGER TUCIBAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION *TERRY S NAHAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE *2/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING *DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Case 282019CP000354PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIVINGSTON, ROBERT EDWARD