This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 23:28:58 (UTC).

DIAS, MARLA, PUNCHES, TERRI LYNN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 DIAS, MARLA, PUNCHES, TERRI LYNN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Claimants

DIAS, MARLA

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Not Classified By Court

PUNCHES, TERRI LYNN

Decedent

TERMAN, CHARLES WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LIVINGSTON, ROBERT EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEstate Claim for $495.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM * CAPTIAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. PLATINUM $495.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 200656

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketORG PROOF OF PUBLICATION 10/30/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS 10/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 199730

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING *DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION *TERRI LYNN PUNCHES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE *7/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197540

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CP000350PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT