Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 20:30:25 (UTC).

DIACHEYSN, JENA ROSE Et Al VS PETROZELLI, JENA ROSE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 DIACHEYSN, JENA ROSE filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against PETROZELLI, JENA ROSE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE, BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE and HEATHER BEATO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE

HEATHER BEATO

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SMITH, MICHAEL ROY II

DIACHEYSN, JENA ROSE

Respondents

PETROZELLI, JENA ROSE

PETROZELLI, MICHAEL ROY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRO SE COURT on 11/16/2020 1045 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results DISPOSED on 11/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketEvent PRO SE COURT scheduled on 11/16/2020 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING (VIRTUAL) 11/16/2020 @10:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFINGERPRINTS ONLY - JENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFINGERPRINTS ONLY - MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED - JENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED - MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM - JENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM - MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020DR000683FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: BUTZ , KELLY PAIGE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less