This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 17:30:28 (UTC).

DEAN, JAMES J, MAIRE, L THOMAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 DEAN, JAMES J, MAIRE, L THOMAS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

DEAN, JAMES J

Decedent

MAIRE, L THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SWAINE, JACK MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • INVENTORY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING * SAFE DEPOSIT INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL PRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 8/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (redocketed to record)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170106

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 5/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 282019CP000255PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less