This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 07:01:25 (UTC).

DANIELS, ROBERT A JR VS TALLY, GAIL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DANIELS, ROBERT A JR filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TALLY, GAIL. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL) and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELS, ROBERT A JR

Defendant

TALLY, GAIL

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED ON 1/08/2020

01/13/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED ON 1/08/2020

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW

01/02/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

12/31/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S BASEKT WITH MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER BY CKW)

12/19/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S BASEKT WITH MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER BY CKW)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW

12/19/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW

RESPONSE (GAIL)

12/18/2019:RESPONSE (GAIL)

ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/11/2019 (GAIL) POSTED

12/12/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/11/2019 (GAIL) POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (GAIL) - COPY (UNEXECUTED PER PLTF'S' REQUEST)

12/11/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (GAIL) - COPY (UNEXECUTED PER PLTF'S' REQUEST)

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY BLJ (GAIL)

12/10/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY BLJ (GAIL)

RECEIPT NUMBER MX 182256

12/10/2019:RECEIPT NUMBER MX 182256

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ROBERT) --- UNEXECUTED PER PLTF'S REQUEST

12/10/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ROBERT) --- UNEXECUTED PER PLTF'S REQUEST

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CSD (GAIL)

12/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CSD (GAIL)

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

12/05/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

15 - DAY NOTICE

12/05/2019:15 - DAY NOTICE

3 - DAY NOTICE

12/05/2019:3 - DAY NOTICE

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILTY/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION

12/05/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILTY/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE (OTHER THAN FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

12/05/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE (OTHER THAN FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

RECEIPT

12/05/2019:RECEIPT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED ON 1/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S BASEKT WITH MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER BY CKW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE (GAIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/11/2019 (GAIL) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (GAIL) - COPY (UNEXECUTED PER PLTF'S' REQUEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY BLJ (GAIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILTY/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE (OTHER THAN FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 181984

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 282019CC000781CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) assigned

    Read MoreRead Less