This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/29/2022 at 15:33:54 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC VS ROBERTS, CHERYL

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERTS, CHERYL. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

Defendant

ROBERTS, CHERYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/29/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

06/29/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BO (CHERYL)

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BO (CHERYL)

SUMMONS SERVED 7/19/2022 (CHERYL) IND

07/22/2022:SUMMONS SERVED 7/19/2022 (CHERYL) IND

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/02/2022 14:45; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 7/19/2022 (CHERYL) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 7/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BO (CHERYL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 8/2/2022 at 0245 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 238146

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase 282022SC000509SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S