This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 07:02:48 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS MCKINNEY, KEVIN W Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against MCKINNEY, KEVIN W. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL) and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

MCKINNEY, STANLEN M

MCKINNEY, KEVIN W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/31/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER (STANLENE)

12/23/2019:ANSWER (STANLENE)

ANSWER (KEVIN)

12/23/2019:ANSWER (KEVIN)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/10/2019 (KEVIN) SUB

12/14/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/10/2019 (KEVIN) SUB

SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/10/2019 (STANLEN) IND

12/11/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/10/2019 (STANLEN) IND

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/06/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (STANLEN)

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (STANLEN)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (KEVIN)

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (KEVIN)

COMPLAINT

12/05/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/05/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/05/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (STANLENE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (KEVIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 12/10/2019 (KEVIN) SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 12/10/2019 (STANLEN) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (STANLEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (KEVIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 181997

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 282019CC000782CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less