This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:02:45 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS DAVIS, MARK

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVIS, MARK. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

DAVIS, MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

ORDER CANCELLING TRIAL (5/1/20 @ 11AM)

04/08/2020:ORDER CANCELLING TRIAL (5/1/20 @ 11AM)

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING BASED ON SUPREME COURT'S ISSUANCE OF AOSC20-17

03/25/2020:ORDER CANCELLING HEARING BASED ON SUPREME COURT'S ISSUANCE OF AOSC20-17

ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC HEARING @ FOR PLTF'S COUNSEL - 4/3/2020 @ 10:30 AM

03/05/2020:ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC HEARING @ FOR PLTF'S COUNSEL - 4/3/2020 @ 10:30 AM

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING (PLTF'S COUNSEL- 4/03/2020 @ 10:30AM)

03/05/2020:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING (PLTF'S COUNSEL- 4/03/2020 @ 10:30AM)

NOTICE OF HEARING (4/03/2020 @ 10:30AM) - PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

03/05/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (4/03/2020 @ 10:30AM) - PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/19/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

02/18/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

DISPOSITION MEMO: TBC SET (ATTY STEWART APPEARED FOR PLTF / DEFT APPEARAED / REPRESENTATIVE MAY APPEAR BY PHONE FOR TBC)

01/28/2020:DISPOSITION MEMO: TBC SET (ATTY STEWART APPEARED FOR PLTF / DEFT APPEARAED / REPRESENTATIVE MAY APPEAR BY PHONE FOR TBC)

SUMMONS SERVED 12/30/19 (MARK) IND

12/31/2019:SUMMONS SERVED 12/30/19 (MARK) IND

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (MARK)

12/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (MARK)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/20/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/01/2020 11:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: NON-JURY TRIAL (TBC); Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event NON-JURY TRIAL (TBC) on 5/1/2020 1100 AM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 4/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING TRIAL (5/1/20 @ 11AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/03/2020 10:30; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: SM CLM; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event SM CLM on 4/3/2020 1030 AM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 3/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING HEARING BASED ON SUPREME COURT'S ISSUANCE OF AOSC20-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC HEARING @ FOR PLTF'S COUNSEL - 4/3/2020 @ 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING (PLTF'S COUNSEL- 4/03/2020 @ 10:30AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (4/03/2020 @ 10:30AM) - PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEvent SM CLM scheduled on 4/3/2020 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 1/28/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182950

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000818SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less