This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 05/02/2022 at 06:06:15 (UTC).

COTTER, BARBARA T VS HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUN

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 COTTER, BARBARA T filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUN. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COWDEN, ANGELA JANE and ANGELA COWDEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

ANGELA COWDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COTTER, BARBARA T

Defendant

HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ARCKEY, ERIC RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/12/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT ON AUTO NEGLIGENCE

10/12/2021:COMPLAINT ON AUTO NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW (HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS)

10/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW (HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS)

RECEIPT MX 220412

10/12/2021:RECEIPT MX 220412

SUMMONS SERVED 10/13/2021 (HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS) SUB

10/15/2021:SUMMONS SERVED 10/13/2021 (HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS) SUB

ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

10/15/2021:ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY ARKEY FOR HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS)

10/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY ARKEY FOR HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS)

DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLTF'S COMPLAINT AND STRIKE PLTF'S EXHIBIT AND CITATIONS TO THE POLICE REPORT

10/20/2021:DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLTF'S COMPLAINT AND STRIKE PLTF'S EXHIBIT AND CITATIONS TO THE POLICE REPORT

DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

10/20/2021:DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF

10/20/2021:DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF

DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLTF

10/20/2021:DEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLTF

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE IN THE REFERENCED CASE

11/09/2021:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE IN THE REFERENCED CASE

NOTICE OF HEARING (12/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE

11/17/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING (12/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE

DEF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (12/13/21 @ 11:00AM) DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLTF'S MOTION TO ABATE

12/10/2021:DEF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (12/13/21 @ 11:00AM) DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLTF'S MOTION TO ABATE

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

01/11/2022:JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/13/2021 11:00; Judge: COWDEN, ANGELA JANE; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua; Defendant Attorney: Arckey, Eric Raymond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (12/13/21 @ 11:00AM) DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLTF'S MOTION TO ABATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event CIRCIVH on 12/13/2021 1100 AM Judge ANGELA COWDEN results CANCELLED on 12/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent CIRCIVH scheduled on 12/13/2021 at 1100 AM, VC - Judge ANGELA COWDEN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (12/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE IN THE REFERENCED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFT HIGHLANDS CO BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT MX 220412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 220412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW (HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ON AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CA000330GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIGHLANDS COUNTY BOARD OF COUN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC ARCKEY