This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 10/07/2019 at 13:30:51 (UTC).

CORNING FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS REEVES, JERRY R

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 CORNING FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against REEVES, JERRY R. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNING FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

REEVES, JERRY R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALTERS, ALISON VERGES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RECORDING / CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

09/16/2019:NOTICE OF RECORDING / CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

LETTER FROM PLTF'S ATTY REQUESTING CASE BE OPENED IN CIRCUIT CIVIL COURT

09/16/2019:LETTER FROM PLTF'S ATTY REQUESTING CASE BE OPENED IN CIRCUIT CIVIL COURT

RECEIPT

09/16/2019:RECEIPT

AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 55.505 / PETITION FOR FOREIGN JUDGMENT

09/13/2019:AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 55.505 / PETITION FOR FOREIGN JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAIL / JERRY R REEVES - 9489009000276011348502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RECORDING / CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER FROM PLTF'S ATTY REQUESTING CASE BE OPENED IN CIRCUIT CIVIL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 176712

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $406.56 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $406.56 Balance Remaining $406.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Attorney: ALISON VERGES WALTERS Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 55.505 / PETITION FOR FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Case 282019CA000486GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT assigned

    Read MoreRead Less