This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/31/2019 at 18:07:49 (UTC).

CORBY WALKER, KIM CHEREE, WALKER, LITTON MEREDITH JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 CORBY WALKER, KIM CHEREE, WALKER, LITTON MEREDITH JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Decedent

WALKER, LITTON MEREDITH JR

Not Classified By Court

CORBY WALKER, KIM CHEREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ROMANO, ANTONIO POULO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 03/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Decedent Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • WAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION *KIM CHEREE CORBY WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE *3/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING *PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (intestate Florida resident - single petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Case 282019CP000359PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANO, ANTONIO