This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 05/02/2022 at 06:13:17 (UTC).

COLLINS, TONEY Et Al VS RODRIGUEZ, MANUEL COLON

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 COLLINS, TONEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, MANUEL COLON. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COWDEN, ANGELA JANE and ANGELA COWDEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

ANGELA COWDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLLINS, TONEY

WILLIS, CHAUNCEY MAURICE

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, MANUEL COLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

12/01/2021:COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/01/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (MANUEL COLON)

12/07/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (MANUEL COLON)

NOTICE OF ACTION

12/07/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION (SENT TO NEWS-SUN - DEFAULT DATE: 1/12/2022 ELECTRONICALLY BY AG)

12/07/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION (SENT TO NEWS-SUN - DEFAULT DATE: 1/12/2022 ELECTRONICALLY BY AG)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION (SENT TO NEWS-SUN - DEFAULT DATE: 1/12/2022 ELECTRONICALLY BY AG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (MANUEL COLON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 223561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $409.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CA000413GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER