This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:32:03 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS MAY, JERRY M

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAY, JERRY M. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

MAY, JERRY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINEN, DREW RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

MILLER VEAL, JENNIFER LYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/31/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/31/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY (FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ. FOR PLTF)

08/31/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY (FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ. FOR PLTF)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

08/31/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JERRY)

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JERRY)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

08/31/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS SERVED 9/16/2021 (JERRY) IND

09/20/2021:SUMMONS SERVED 9/16/2021 (JERRY) IND

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (10/19/2021 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

09/21/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (10/19/2021 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY VEAL FOR DEFT)

10/18/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY VEAL FOR DEFT)

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - CONTINUE PENDING INFORMAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES

10/20/2021:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - CONTINUE PENDING INFORMAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (12/14/2021 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

12/05/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (12/14/2021 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - DEFT HAS BEEN HOSPITALIZED - CONTINUED TO 2/15/2022 @ 1PM

12/17/2021:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - DEFT HAS BEEN HOSPITALIZED - CONTINUED TO 2/15/2022 @ 1PM

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT ***PROPOSED***

01/25/2022:STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT ***PROPOSED***

ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CASE

02/07/2022:ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CASE

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

02/16/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/15/2022 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: VEAL, JENNIFER MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT ***PROPOSED***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 2/15/2022 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 1/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - DEFT HAS BEEN HOSPITALIZED - CONTINUED TO 2/15/2022 @ 1PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 2/15/2022 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 12/14/2021 0200 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 12/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY (FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ. FOR PLTF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 217707

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase 282021SC000656SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER LYNN MILLER VEAL